Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06755 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note May 23, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 25, 2023
Analysis May 23, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023