House
|
06/28/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Public Act 23-150
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
File Number 859
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 591
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 9151
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9075
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
File Number 535
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
House Calendar Number 330
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|