Senate | 06/06/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 621 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10043 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | File Number 410 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | House Calendar Number 273 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |