Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06805 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 7, 2023
Fiscal Note June 6, 2023
Fiscal Note June 5, 2023
Fiscal Note April 4, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023