House | 03/22/2023 | File Number 171 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | House Calendar Number 136 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |