Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06821 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 31, 2023
Fiscal Note May 30, 2023
Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 22, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 22, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023