House
|
06/27/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Public Act 23-130
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
File Number 855
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 590
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8620
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
File Number 368
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
House Calendar Number 255
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|