Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06839 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 2, 2023
Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis August 11, 2023
Analysis June 2, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 15, 2023