House | 04/12/2023 | File Number 543 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | House Calendar Number 338 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |