LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00208
Action History
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00208
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2023 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00208
Action History
Senate
02/24/2023
Public Hearing 02/28
Senate
02/17/2023
Public Hearing 02/21
Senate
02/16/2023
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
Senate
02/15/2023
Drafted by Committee
Senate
01/19/2023
Vote to Draft