Senate | 06/12/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Public Act 23-35 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | House Calendar Number 522 | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | File Number 97 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 87 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Public Hearing 01/31 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |