Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00913 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/05/2023

                             
 
 
Substitute Senate Bill No. 913 
 
Public Act No. 23-35 
 
 
AN ACT EXPANDING WORKERS' COMPENSATION COVERAGE 
FOR POST -TRAUMATIC STRESS INJURIES FOR ALL 
EMPLOYEES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsections (a) and (b) of section 31-294k of the general 
statutes are repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof 
(Effective January 1, 2024): 
(a) As used in this section: 
(1) "COVID-19" means the respiratory disease designated by the 
World Health Organization on February 11, 2020, as coronavirus 2019, 
and any related mutation thereof recognized by the World Health 
Organization as a communicable respiratory disease; 
(2) "Eligible individual" means a police officer, firefighter, emergency 
medical services personnel, Department of Correction employee, 
telecommunicator or health care provider, and on and after January 1, 
2024, an employee; 
(3) "Emergency medical services personnel" has the same meaning as 
provided in section 20-206jj;  Substitute Senate Bill No. 913 
 
Public Act No. 23-35 	2 of 6 
 
(4) "Employee" has the same meaning as provided in section 31-275; 
[(4)] (5) "Firefighter" has the same meaning as provided in section 7-
313g; 
[(5)] (6) "Health care provider" means (A) a person employed at a 
doctor's office, hospital, health care center, clinic, medical school, local 
health department or agency, nursing facility, retirement facility, 
nursing home, group home, home health care provider, any facility that 
performs laboratory or medical testing, pharmacy or any similar 
institution, or (B) a person employed to provide personal care 
assistance, as defined in section 17b-706, in or about a private dwelling, 
provided such person is regularly employed by the owner or occupier 
of the dwelling for more than twenty-six hours per week; 
[(6)] (7) "In the line of duty" means any action that an eligible 
individual is obligated or authorized by law, rule, regulation or written 
condition of employment service to perform, or for which the eligible 
individual is compensated by the public entity such individual serves, 
except that, in the case of a volunteer firefighter, such action or service 
constitutes fire duties, as defined in subsection (b) of section 7-314b; 
[(7)] (8) "Mental health professional" means a board-certified 
psychiatrist or a psychologist licensed pursuant to chapter 383, who has 
experience diagnosing and treating post-traumatic stress injury; 
[(8)] (9) "Parole officer" means an employee of the Department of 
Correction who supervises inmates in the community after their release 
from prison on parole or under another prison release program; 
[(9)] (10) "Police officer" has the same meaning as provided in section 
7-294a, except that "police officer" does not include an officer of a law 
enforcement unit of the Mashantucket Pequot Tribe or the Mohegan 
Tribe of Indians of Connecticut;  Substitute Senate Bill No. 913 
 
Public Act No. 23-35 	3 of 6 
 
[(10)] (11) "Post-traumatic stress injury" means an injury that meets 
the diagnostic criteria for post-traumatic stress disorder as specified in 
the most recent edition of the American Psychiatric Association's 
"Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders"; 
[(11)] (12) "Qualifying event" means: 
(A) An event occurring in the line of duty on or after July 1, 2019, in 
which a police officer, parole officer, firefighter, emergency medical 
services personnel, Department of Correction employee or 
telecommunicator: 
(i) Views a deceased minor; 
(ii) Witnesses the death of a person or an incident involving the death 
of a person; 
(iii) Witnesses an injury to a person who subsequently dies before or 
upon admission at a hospital as a result of the injury and not as a result 
of any other intervening cause; 
(iv) Has physical contact with and treats an injured person who 
subsequently dies before or upon admission at a hospital as a result of 
the injury and not as a result of any other intervening cause; 
(v) Carries an injured person who subsequently dies before or upon 
admission at a hospital as a result of the injury and not as a result of any 
other intervening cause; or 
(vi) Witnesses a traumatic physical injury that results in the loss of a 
vital body part or a vital body function that results in permanent 
disfigurement of the victim; [, or] 
(B) An event arising out of and in the course of employment on or 
after March 10, 2020, in which an eligible individual who is a health care 
provider is engaged in activities substantially dedicated to mitigating or  Substitute Senate Bill No. 913 
 
Public Act No. 23-35 	4 of 6 
 
responding to the public health and civil preparedness emergencies 
declared by the Governor on March 10, 2020, or any extension of such 
emergency declarations; [,] and: 
(i) Witnesses the death of a person due to COVID-19 or due to 
symptoms that were later diagnosed as COVID-19; 
(ii) Witnesses an injury to a person who subsequently dies as a result 
of COVID-19 or due to symptoms that were later diagnosed as COVID-
19; 
(iii) Has physical contact with and treats or provides care for a person 
who subsequently dies as a result of COVID-19 or due to symptoms that 
were later diagnosed as COVID-19; or 
(iv) Witnesses a traumatic physical injury that results in the loss of a 
vital body function of a person due to COVID-19 or due to symptoms 
that were later diagnosed as COVID-19; or 
(C) An event arising out of and in the course of employment on and 
after January 1, 2024, in which an employee: 
(i) Views a deceased minor; 
(ii) Witnesses the death of a person or an incident involving the death 
of a person; 
(iii) Witnesses an injury to a person who subsequently dies before or 
upon admission at a hospital as a result of the injury and not as a result 
of any other intervening cause; 
(iv) Has physical contact with and treats an injured person who 
subsequently dies before or upon admission at a hospital as a result of 
the injury and not as a result of any other intervening cause; 
(v) Carries an injured person who subsequently dies before or upon  Substitute Senate Bill No. 913 
 
Public Act No. 23-35 	5 of 6 
 
admission at a hospital as a result of the injury and not as a result of any 
other intervening cause; or 
(vi) Witnesses a traumatic physical injury that results in the loss of a 
vital body part or a vital body function that results in permanent 
disfigurement of the victim; 
[(12)] (13) "Telecommunicator" has the same meaning as provided in 
section 28-30; and 
[(13)] (14) "Witnesses" means, for an eligible individual who is a 
telecommunicator, hears by telephone or radio while directly 
responding to an emergency call that constitutes a qualifying event 
under this section and providing a dispatch assignment. 
(b) A diagnosis of post-traumatic stress injury is compensable as a 
personal injury as described in subparagraph (B)(ii)(III) of subdivision 
(16) of section 31-275 if a mental health professional examines the 
eligible individual and diagnoses [the] such individual with a post-
traumatic stress injury as a direct result of a qualifying event, provided 
(1) the post-traumatic stress injury resulted from (A) the eligible 
individual acting in the line of duty if such individual is a police officer, 
firefighter, emergency medical services personnel, Department of 
Correction employee or telecommunicator and, in the case of a 
firefighter, such firefighter complied with Federal Occupational Safety 
and Health Act standards adopted pursuant to 29 CFR 1910.134 and 29 
CFR 1910.156, or (B) the eligible individual acting the course of 
employment if such individual is a health care provider or other 
employee, on and after January 1, 2024, (2) a qualifying event was a 
substantial factor in causing the injury, and (3) the post-traumatic stress 
injury did not result from any disciplinary action, work evaluation, job 
transfer, layoff, demotion, promotion, termination, retirement or similar 
action of the eligible individual. Any such mental health professional 
shall comply with any workers' compensation guidelines for approved  Substitute Senate Bill No. 913 
 
Public Act No. 23-35 	6 of 6 
 
medical providers, including, but not limited to, guidelines on release 
of past or contemporaneous medical records.