Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00931 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 1, 2023
Fiscal Note April 24, 2023
Fiscal Note March 14, 2023
Bill January 31, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023