Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00931 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/09/2023

                             
 
LCO 3450  \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-00931-R02-
SB.docx  
1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 931  
January Session, 2023 
LCO No. 3450 
 
 
Referred to Committee on AGING  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(AGE)  
 
 
 
AN ACT EXPANDING ACCESS TO THE ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE 
RESPITE CARE PROGRAM.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 17a-860 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2023): 2 
(a) As used in this section: 3 
(1) "Respite care services" means support services which provide 4 
short-term relief from the demands of ongoing care for an individual 5 
with Alzheimer's disease. 6 
(2) "Caretaker" means a person who has the responsibility for the care 7 
of an individual with Alzheimer's disease or has assumed the 8 
responsibility for such individual voluntarily, by contract or by order of 9 
a court of competent jurisdiction. 10 
(3) "Copayment" means a payment made by or on behalf of an 11 
individual with Alzheimer's disease for respite care services. 12  Bill No. 931 
 
 
LCO 3450  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-00931-
R02-SB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
(4) "Individual with Alzheimer's disease" means an individual with 13 
Alzheimer's disease or related disorders. 14 
(b) The Commissioner of Aging and Disability Services shall operate 15 
a program [, within available appropriations,] to provide respite care 16 
services for caretakers of individuals with Alzheimer's disease, 17 
provided such individuals with Alzheimer's disease meet the 18 
requirements set forth in subsection (c) of this section. Such respite care 19 
services may include, but need not be limited to: (1) [homemaker] 20 
Homemaker services; (2) adult day care; (3) temporary care in a licensed 21 
medical facility; (4) home-health care; (5) companion services; or (6) 22 
personal care assistant services. Such respite care services may be 23 
administered directly by the Department of Aging and Disability 24 
Services, or through contracts for services with providers of such 25 
services, or by means of direct subsidy to caretakers of individuals with 26 
Alzheimer's disease to purchase such services. 27 
(c) (1) No individual with Alzheimer's disease may participate in the 28 
program if such individual (A) has an annual income of more than 29 
[forty-one] seventy thousand dollars or liquid assets of more than one 30 
hundred [nine] seventy-nine thousand dollars, or (B) is receiving 31 
services under the Connecticut home-care program for the elderly. [On 32 
July 1, 2009, and annually thereafter, the] The commissioner shall 33 
increase such income and asset eligibility criteria over that of the 34 
previous fiscal year to reflect the annual cost of living adjustment in 35 
Social Security income, if any. 36 
(2) No individual with Alzheimer's disease who participates in the 37 
program may receive more than three thousand five hundred dollars for 38 
services under the program in any fiscal year or receive more than thirty 39 
days of out-of-home respite care services other than adult day care 40 
services under the program in any fiscal year, except that the 41 
commissioner shall adopt regulations pursuant to subsection (d) of this 42 
section to provide up to seven thousand five hundred dollars for 43 
services to a participant in the program who demonstrates a need for 44 
additional services. 45  Bill No. 931 
 
 
LCO 3450  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-00931-
R02-SB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
(3) The commissioner may require an individual with Alzheimer's 46 
disease who participates in the program to pay a copayment for respite 47 
care services under the program, except the commissioner may waive 48 
such copayment upon demonstration of financial hardship by such 49 
individual. 50 
(d) The commissioner shall adopt regulations in accordance with the 51 
provisions of chapter 54 to implement the provisions of this section. 52 
Such regulations shall include, but need not be limited to: (1) [standards] 53 
Standards for eligibility for respite care services; (2) the basis for priority 54 
in receiving services; (3) qualifications and requirements of providers, 55 
which shall include specialized training in Alzheimer's disease, 56 
dementia and related disorders; (4) a requirement that providers 57 
accredited by the Joint Commission on the Accreditation of Healthcare 58 
Organizations, when available, receive preference in contracting for 59 
services; (5) provider reimbursement levels; (6) limits on services and 60 
cost of services; and (7) a fee schedule for copayments. 61 
(e) The commissioner may allocate any funds appropriated in excess 62 
of five hundred thousand dollars for the program among the five area 63 
agencies on aging according to need, as determined by the 64 
commissioner.  65 
Sec. 2. Subsection (g) of section 17a-780 of the general statutes is 66 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 67 
2023): 68 
(g) The Department of Aging and Disability Services is designated as 69 
the State Unit on Aging to administer, manage, design and advocate for 70 
benefits, programs and services for older persons and their families 71 
pursuant to the Older Americans Act. The department shall study 72 
continuously the conditions and needs of older persons in this state in 73 
relation to nutrition, transportation, home care, housing, income, 74 
employment, health, recreation and other matters. The department shall 75 
be responsible, in cooperation with federal, state, local and area 76 
planning agencies on aging, for the overall planning, development and 77  Bill No. 931 
 
 
LCO 3450  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-00931-
R02-SB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
administration of a comprehensive and integrated social service 78 
delivery system for older persons. The Department of Aging and 79 
Disability Services is designated as the state agency for the 80 
administration of nutritional programs for elderly persons described in 81 
section 17a-852, the fall prevention program described in section 17a-82 
859, the CHOICES program described in section 17a-857, the Aging and 83 
Disability Resource Center Program described in section 17a-858 and 84 
the Alzheimer's [respite] disease respite care program described in 85 
section [17b-860] 17a-860, as amended by this act. 86 
Sec. 3. (Effective July 1, 2023) (a) The sum of one million dollars is 87 
appropriated to the Department of Aging and Disability Services from 88 
the General Fund, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, to expand 89 
access to the Alzheimer's disease respite care program. 90 
(b) The sum of one million dollars is appropriated to the Department 91 
of Aging and Disability Services from the General Fund, for the fiscal 92 
year ending June 30, 2025, to expand access to the Alzheimer's disease 93 
respite care program. 94 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2023 17a-860 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2023 17a-780(g) 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2023 New section 
 
AGE Joint Favorable  
APP Joint Favorable