Senate | 06/29/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Special Act 23-23 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | House Calendar Number 482 | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | File Number 339 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 199 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |