Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00933 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note April 24, 2023
Fiscal Note March 30, 2023
Bill January 31, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023