Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Public Act 23-169
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9632
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Calendar Number 510
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7578
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7495
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
File Number 508
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 304
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|