Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00952 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 5, 2023
Fiscal Note June 2, 2023
Fiscal Note June 1, 2023
Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note April 12, 2023
Bill February 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis September 22, 2023
Analysis June 3, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 21, 2023