House | 05/26/2023 | House Calendar Number 603 | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8591 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | File Number 240 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 165 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |