Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00961 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 28, 2023
Bill February 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 25, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023