Senate | 04/04/2023 | File Number 426 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 239 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |