Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00995 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/04/2023

                             
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-00995-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 995  
January Session, 2023 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING REMOVABLE WINDSHIELD PLACARDS FOR 
PERSONS WHO ARE BLIND AND PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 14-253a of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective 2 
October 1, 2023): 3 
(a) For the purposes of this section: 4 
(1) "Special license plate" means a license plate displaying the 5 
symbol of access in a size identical to that of the letters or numerals on 6 
the plate and in a color that contrasts with the background color of the 7 
plate; 8 
(2) "Removable windshield placard" means a two-sided, hanger-9 
style placard which bears on both of its sides: (A) The symbol of access 10 
in a height of three inches or more centered on such placard and 11 
colored white on a blue background; (B) a unique identification 12 
number; (C) a date of expiration; [and] (D) a statement indicating that 13 
the Connecticut Department of Motor Vehicles issued such placard; 14 
and (E) the words "Accessibility Parking Permit"; 15 
(3) "Temporary removable windshield placard" means a placard 16 
that is the same as a removable windshield placard except that the 17  Substitute Bill No. 995 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-00995-
R01-SB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
symbol of access appears on a red background; 18 
(4) "Person with disabilities" means a person with disabilities which 19 
limit or impair the ability to walk, as defined in 23 CFR Section 1235.2; 20 
and 21 
(5) "Symbol of access" means the symbol designated by the 22 
Commissioner of Administrative Services pursuant to section 29-269b 23 
used to indicate access for persons with disabilities. 24 
Sec. 2. Subsection (d) of section 14-253a of the general statutes is 25 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective 26 
October 1, 2023): 27 
(d) (1) Any placard issued pursuant to this section shall be 28 
displayed by hanging it from the front windshield rearview mirror of 29 
the vehicle when utilizing a parking space reserved for persons who 30 
are blind and persons with disabilities. If there is no rearview mirror in 31 
such vehicle, the placard shall be displayed in clear view on the 32 
dashboard of such vehicle. 33 
(2) On and after October 1, 2023, any placard issued pursuant to this 34 
section shall not bear the words "parking permit for persons with 35 
disabilities". Any placard issued prior to October 1, 2023, that is 36 
otherwise valid, shall remain valid, according to its terms, until the 37 
expiration of such placard. 38 
Sec. 3. Subsection (o) of section 14-253a of the general statutes is 39 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective 40 
October 1, 2023): 41 
(o) The commissioner shall [periodically] check the Department of 42 
Public Health's state registration of deaths on a monthly basis and 43 
shall cancel any placard issued to an individual identified in such 44 
registry as deceased. 45 
Sec. 4. (Effective from passage) (a) Not later than August 1, 2023, the 46  Substitute Bill No. 995 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-00995-
R01-SB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
Commissioner of Motor Vehicles and the Deputy Commissioner of 47 
Emergency Services and Public Protection with jurisdiction over the 48 
Division of State Police shall jointly convene a working group to: (1) 49 
Review the laws in other states concerning the issuance and use of 50 
removable windshield placards for persons who are blind and persons 51 
with disabilities, (2) recommend best practices for policies and 52 
regulations regarding the application for, and issuance and use of, 53 
removable windshield placards, (3) make educational materials 54 
available to medical professionals, law enforcement officers and the 55 
general public regarding the proper issuance and use of such 56 
removable windshield placards, and (4) review the status of such 57 
removable windshield placards issued to persons who are blind and 58 
persons with disabilities prior to January 1, 2010, for the lifetime of 59 
such persons. 60 
(b) The working group shall be comprised of (1) the Commissioner 61 
of Motor Vehicles, or the commissioner's designee, (2) the Deputy 62 
Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection with 63 
jurisdiction over the Division of State Police, or the deputy 64 
commissioner's designee, (3) two or more licensed physicians, 65 
physician assistants or advanced practice registered nurses who certify 66 
applications for removable windshield placards while in the course of 67 
employment, (4) two or more sworn members of a municipal police 68 
department, and (5) any other person invited by the commissioner and 69 
deputy commissioner to be a member of the working group. 70 
(c) Not later than January 1, 2024, the working group shall submit a 71 
report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general 72 
statutes, regarding the findings of the working group, the education 73 
materials developed pursuant to subsection (a) of this section and any 74 
recommendations to the joint standing committee of the General 75 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to transportation. The 76 
working group shall terminate on the date that it submits such report 77 
or January 1, 2024, whichever is later. 78  Substitute Bill No. 995 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-00995-
R01-SB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2023 14-253a(a) 
Sec. 2 October 1, 2023 14-253a(d) 
Sec. 3 October 1, 2023 14-253a(o) 
Sec. 4 from passage New section 
 
TRA Joint Favorable Subst.