Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00995 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/04/2023

                     
Researcher: JP 	Page 1 	4/4/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 995  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING REMOVABLE WINDSHIELD PLACARDS 
FOR PERSONS WHO ARE BLIND AND PERSONS WITH 
DISABILITIES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes several changes to the laws on windshield parking 
placards used by people with certain disabilities or blindness. It requires 
these placards to bear the words “Accessibility Parking Permit” and, 
beginning October 1, 2023, prohibits any issued placard from bearing 
the words “parking permit for persons with disabilities.” However, 
under the bill, any otherwise valid placard issued before this date is 
valid until it expires. 
The bill also requires the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) 
commissioner to check the Department of Public Health’s state death 
registry at least monthly, rather than periodically as under current law, 
and cancel placards issued to deceased people identified in the registry, 
which conforms to current DMV practice. 
By August 1, 2023, the bill requires the DMV Commissioner and the 
Deputy Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection 
with jurisdiction over the state police to jointly convene a working 
group, of which they or their designees are also members, comprised of: 
1. two or more licensed physicians, physician assistants, or 
advanced practice registered nurses whose work includes 
certifying applications for removable windshield placards;  
2. two or more sworn municipal police department members; and  
3. any other person they invite to be a member. 
The working group must review the status of lifetime removable  2023SB-00995-R000426-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JP 	Page 2 	4/4/23 
 
placards issued prior to January 1, 2010. Regarding the issuance and use 
of removable placards, the group must (1) review other states’ laws; (2) 
recommend best practices to the DMV commissioner for clear and 
concise policies and regulations, including for applying for placards; 
and (3) make educational materials available to medical professionals, 
law enforcement officers, and the general public.  
The group must submit a report on its findings, the education 
materials developed, and any recommendations to the Transportation 
Committee by January 1, 2024. The bill sunsets the group on this date or 
its reporting date, whichever is later. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2023, except the working group is 
effective upon passage. 
BACKGROUND 
DMV Study 
PA 22-44, § 17, required the DMV commissioner to report to the 
Transportation Committee on the results of her review of other states’ 
laws and regulations, and any legislative or regulatory 
recommendations on applying for, issuing, and using removeable 
windshield placards for people with disabilities or blindness. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Transportation Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 36 Nay 0 (03/17/2023)