Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00996 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note May 23, 2023
Fiscal Note March 22, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 24, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023