House | 05/24/2023 | House Calendar Number 586 | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7114 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | File Number 104 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 94 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |