Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01025 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 23, 2023
Fiscal Note April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note March 16, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 24, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023