Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01025 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/16/2023

                     
Researcher: SL 	Page 1 	3/16/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 1025  
 
AN ACT IMPLEMENTING THE RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE 
HOMEMAKER -COMPANION AGENCY TASK FORCE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill implements various recommendations from the 
Homemaker-Companion Task Force on how the state regulates 
homemaker-companion agencies. Among other things, the bill requires 
the Department of Consumer Protection (DCP) commissioner to (1) 
revoke a homemaker-companion agency’s registration if it violates 
certain statutory requirements three times in a calendar year, (2) 
develop training standards for the agencies’ employees, (3) identify 
training programs that teach these standards, and (4) develop a plan to 
implement mandatory training standards. 
The bill requires the written contracts or service plans that the 
agencies must give consumers (i.e., the people receiving services or their 
authorized representatives) to include certain information on how the 
agency oversees its employees. It also requires the DCP commissioner 
to develop (1) a model written contract and service plan and (2) a guide 
on how consumers can file a complaint against a homemaker-
companion agency, which must be given to consumers with the 
contracts or service plans. 
The bill requires the Office of Policy and Management secretary to 
develop a plan to transfer, by July 1, 2024, homemaker-companion 
agency registration and oversight responsibilities from DCP to the 
Department of Public Health (DPH). He must do this in consultation 
with the DCP and DPH commissioners and report on the plan to the 
Aging, General Law, and Public Health committees by February 1, 2024.  
The bill also requires every homemaker-companion agency, by 
January 1, 2024, to create a printed consumer brochure and maintain a  2023SB-01025-R000104-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SL 	Page 2 	3/16/23 
 
website detailing the services it provides. An agency must provide the 
brochure or website address when a consumer requests it (§ 7).  
Lastly, the bill (1) allows a homemaker-companion agency to use (a) 
the term “care” in its business name and advertising to describe the 
services it provides and (b) any words deemed appropriate by the DCP 
commissioner to describe having employees trained to provide services 
to people with memory difficulties and (2) specifies that the homemaker 
services provided by the agencies are in-home services (§§ 8-9).   
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage, except for the requirement that 
DCP post a guide on filing complaints, which is effective October 1, 
2023. 
§ 2 — REGISTRATION REVOCATION 
The law generally allows the DCP commissioner to revoke, suspend, 
or refuse to issue or renew a homemaker -companion agency’s 
registration for (1) conduct that misleads or defrauds the public or 
commissioner, (2) engaging in misleading advertising, (3) failing to give 
a consumer a notice of legal liabilities under certain circumstances, or 
(4) failing to complete background checks on prospective employees 
and maintain the materials from them.  
The bill requires the DCP commissioner to revoke a homemaker-
companion agency’s registration if the agency violates any of these 
provisions three times in a calendar year.  
§§ 3 & 4 — TRAINING STANDARDS 
The bill requires the DCP commissioner to develop training 
standards for homemaker-companion agency employees and identify 
training programs that instruct on these standards. She must do this in 
consultation with the DPH commissioner and with guidance from 
relevant training organizations by January 1, 2024. The standards must 
(1) show the best practices for providing homemaker-companion 
services, (2) have instruction and training benchmarks for caring for 
people with memory disorders, and (3) ensure high quality care for 
clients.   2023SB-01025-R000104-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SL 	Page 3 	3/16/23 
 
The bill requires the DCP commissioner to post the training 
standards and identified training programs on DCP’s website, and it 
allows homemaker-companion agencies to adopt the standards and 
train employees using the posted training programs. The bill also 
requires the commissioner to develop a plan to implement mandatory 
training standards for homemaker-companion agency employees and 
report this plan to the Aging Committee by February 1, 2024.  
§ 5 — CONTRACTS & SERVICE PLANS 
Current law requires homemaker-companion agencies to give 
consumers a written contract or service plan detailing the anticipated 
scope, type, frequency, duration, and cost of services provided by the 
agency within seven days of beginning services.  
The bill additionally requires the agencies to develop this plan or 
contract in consultation with the consumer and expands the information 
that must be in it to include: 
1. a person-centered plan of care and services;  
2. the anticipated scope, type, and frequency of oversight by the 
agency over the employee assigned to the consumer; and  
3. how often the person who oversees the agency’s employee and 
the consumer will meet.  
The bill requires the DCP commissioner to develop a model service 
plan and written contract and post them on DCP’s website by January 
1, 2024. By law, a service plan or contract between a homemaker-
companion agency and a consumer is not enforceable unless it contains 
all required information.  
§§ 5 & 6 — COMPLAINTS 
The bill requires the DCP commissioner, by October 1, 2023, to post 
on DCP’s website a guide detailing the process for homemaker-
companion agency consumers to file complaints against an agency. It 
requires the agencies to also give consumers a printed copy of this guide 
when they give them the written contract or service plan as described  2023SB-01025-R000104-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SL 	Page 4 	3/16/23 
 
above. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Aging Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 15 Nay 0 (02/28/2023)