Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01025 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/24/2023

                     
Researcher: SL 	Page 1 	5/24/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 1025 (File 104, as amended by Senate "A")*  
 
AN ACT IMPLEMENTING THE RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE 
HOMEMAKER -COMPANION AGENCY TASK FORCE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill implements various recommendations from the 
Homemaker-Companion Task Force on how the state regulates 
homemaker-companion agencies. Among other things, it: 
1. requires the Office of Policy and Management (OPM) secretary 
to develop a plan and proposed timeline to transfer homemaker-
companion agency registration and oversight responsibilities 
from the Department of Consumer Protection (DCP) to the 
Department of Public Health (DPH); 
2. requires the DCP commissioner to revoke a homemaker-
companion agency’s registration if it violates certain statutory 
requirements three times in a calendar year; 
3. requires the written contracts or service plans that the agencies 
must give consumers (i.e., the people receiving services or their 
authorized representatives) to include certain information on 
how the agency oversees its employees; 
4. requires the DCP commissioner to develop a guide on how 
consumers can file a complaint against a homemaker-companion 
agency, which must be given to consumers with the contracts or 
service plans;  
5. requires every homemaker-companion agency, by January 1, 
2024, to (a) create a printed consumer brochure and maintain a 
website detailing the services it provides and (b) provide the 
brochure or website address when a consumer requests it (§ 7);  2023SB-01025-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SL 	Page 2 	5/24/23 
 
6. allows a homemaker-companion agency to use the term “care” in 
its business name and advertising to describe the services it 
provides, with certain requirements; and 
7. requires an agency to give consumers written notice that it 
provides nonmedical services and obtain the consumer’s 
signature on this notice. 
*Senate Amendment “A” (1) requires that OPM’s plan to transfer 
homemaker-companion agency oversight include a proposed timeline 
for the transfer, rather than prescribing a date for the transfer; (2) 
removes the requirement that DCP develop training standards and 
instead directs OPM to include training standards recommendations in 
its plan to transfer oversight; (3) removes a provision that would have 
required DCP create a model service plan and contract; and (4) sets 
requirements a homemaker-companion agency must meet in order to 
use the term “care” in its business name or advertising, specifies that 
failure to meet these requirements constitutes untruthful advertising, 
and requires the agencies to provide written notice that their services 
are nonmedical. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage, except for the requirement that 
DCP post a guide on filing complaints, which is effective October 1, 
2023. 
§ 1 — OPM TRANSITION PLAN 
The bill requires the OPM secretary to develop a plan and proposed 
timeline to transfer homemaker-companion agency registration and 
oversight responsibilities from DCP to DPH. The plan must also include 
recommendations on training standards that (1) exemplify best 
practices for providing homemaker-companion services; (2) provide 
instruction and specialized training benchmarks for caring for clients 
with Alzheimer’s disease, dementia, and related conditions; and (3) 
ensure a high level of care for homemaker-companion agency clients. It 
may also evaluate and make recommendations on the appropriate use 
of the term “care” to describe services homemaker-companion agencies 
provide, and any limitations on using the term to ensure consumer  2023SB-01025-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SL 	Page 3 	5/24/23 
 
clarity.  
The secretary must prepare the plan in consultation with the DCP 
and DPH commissioners and report on it to the Aging, General Law, 
and Public Health committees by August 1, 2024.  
§ 2 — REGISTRATION REVOCATION 
Current law generally allows the DCP commissioner to revoke, 
suspend, or refuse to issue or renew a homemaker-companion agency’s 
registration for (1) conduct that misleads or defrauds the public or 
commissioner, (2) engaging in misleading advertising, (3) failing to give 
a consumer a notice of legal liabilities under certain circumstances, or 
(4) failing to complete background checks on prospective employees 
and maintain the materials from them. The bill also allows the 
commissioner to do this if an agency fails to give a consumer written 
notice, or obtain and maintain the consumer’s signed copy of this notice, 
that the agency provides nonmedical care, as required by the bill (see § 
501).  
In addition, the bill requires the DCP commissioner to revoke a 
homemaker-companion agency’s registration if the agency is found, 
through an administrative hearing, to have violated any of these 
provisions three times in a calendar year.  
§ 5 — CONTRACTS & SERVI CE PLANS 
Current law requires homemaker-companion agencies to give 
consumers a written contract or service plan detailing the anticipated 
scope, type, frequency, duration, and cost of services provided by the 
agency within seven days of beginning services.  
The bill additionally requires the agencies to develop this plan or 
contract in consultation with the consumer and expands the information 
that must be in it to include: 
1. a person-centered plan of care and services;  
2. the anticipated scope, type, and frequency of oversight by the 
agency over the employee assigned to the consumer; and   2023SB-01025-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SL 	Page 4 	5/24/23 
 
3. how often the person who oversees the agency’s employee and 
the consumer will meet.  
§§ 5 & 6 — COMPLAINTS 
The bill requires the DCP commissioner, by October 1, 2023, to post 
on DCP’s website a guide detailing the process for homemaker-
companion agency consumers to file complaints against an agency. It 
requires the agencies to also give consumers a printed copy of this guide 
when they give them the written contract or service plan as described 
above. 
§§ 8, 9 & 501 — ADVERTISING AND SCO PE OF SERVICES 
Under the bill, a homemaker-companion agency may use the term 
“care” in its business name and advertising, as long as, on and after 
October 1, 2023, any advertising meets certain conditions. Specifically, 
it must (1) include in at least 12-point font at the top of the advertising, 
the clear and conspicuous words: “(agency’s name) provides 
nonmedical care” and (2) not use any words, such as those related to 
medical or health care licensure or services, to describe services beyond 
the scope of those a homemaker-companion agency is authorized to 
provide. A violation of this provision constitutes untruthful or 
misleading advertising (see § 2).  
Before providing services, a homemaker-companion agency must (1) 
give consumers written notice that the agency provides nonmedical care 
and (2) obtain the consumer’s signature on this notice. The agency must 
keep the signed notice until the consumer no longer receives services 
from the agency and make a copy of the signed notice available to the 
DCP commissioner upon request. 
By law, homemaker-companion agencies may provide (1) 
“homemaker services” which are nonmedical and supportive services, 
such as assistance with cooking, household cleaning, laundry, and 
personal hygiene, to ensure a healthy and safe environment for a 
consumer in a consumer’s home and (2) “companion services” which 
are nonmedical, basic supervision services to ensure the safety and 
wellbeing of a consumer in a consumer’s home. The bill further specifies  2023SB-01025-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SL 	Page 5 	5/24/23 
 
that these homemaker services are in-home care services. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Aging Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 15 Nay 0 (02/28/2023) 
 
Appropriations Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 53 Nay 0 (05/01/2023)