Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Public Act 23-127
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
House Calendar Number 627
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9202
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
File Number 385
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 221
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 12:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|