Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01039 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 2, 2023
Fiscal Note June 1, 2023
Fiscal Note May 30, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis July 25, 2023
Analysis June 2, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 15, 2023