LCO \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01083-R01- SB.docx 1 of 3 General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 1083 January Session, 2023 AN ACT ESTABLISHING A TRANSPORTATION CARBON BUDGET FOR THE STATE. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2023) (a) Not later than July 1, 1 2030, and annually thereafter, the Commissioner of Transportation, in 2 consultation with the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 3 Protection, shall establish a transportation carbon budget for the state 4 that sets the maximum amount of greenhouse gas emissions permitted 5 from the transportation sector. The commissioners shall consider the 6 long-term emission reductions required by section 22a-200a of the 7 general statutes when establishing the transportation carbon budget. 8 (b) The Commissioner of Transportation shall adopt regulations, in 9 accordance with the provisions of chapter 54 of the general statutes, to 10 ensure transportation projects undertaken by the Department of 11 Transportation, metropolitan planning organizations, as defined in 23 12 USC 134, as amended from time to time, and municipalities do not 13 exceed the maximum amount of greenhouse gas emissions established 14 in the transportation carbon budget for the state pursuant to 15 subsection (a) of this section. The regulations shall include, but need 16 not be limited to, (1) a definition of "transportation project" that 17 excludes transportation projects that are necessary for safety reasons or 18 maintenance, (2) the methodology to calculate the greenhouse gas 19 Substitute Bill No. 1083 LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01083- R01-SB.docx } 2 of 3 emissions expected from future transportation projects, (3) where such 20 projects are estimated to increase net greenhouse gas emissions, the 21 ways to offset such emissions by undertaking greenhouse gas 22 mitigation transportation projects that will reduce such emissions, and 23 (4) a description of such greenhouse gas mitigation transportation 24 projects, including, but not limited to, improving public 25 transportation, constructing bikeways, pedestrian walkways or other 26 multiuse trails or paths and installing electric vehicle charging 27 infrastructure. Not later than July 1, 2028, the commissioner shall 28 submit the regulations to the standing legislative regulation review 29 committee for consideration under section 4-170 of the general statutes. 30 (c) The Commissioner of Transportation, in consultation with the 31 Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection, shall 32 implement a public outreach plan to ensure sufficient public and 33 stakeholder engagement in the development of the transportation 34 carbon budget and the regulations required under subsection (b) of 35 this section. 36 (d) On or before January 1, 2025, and annually thereafter until 37 January 1, 2030, the Commissioner of Transportation shall submit, in 38 accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 39 a report to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly 40 having cognizance of matters relating to transportation and the 41 environment. Such report shall include, but need not be limited to, the 42 status of the development of the transportation carbon budget for the 43 state and the regulations required under subsection (b) of this section, 44 the level of collaboration among various stakeholders, and a 45 description and the results of any public outreach conducted pursuant 46 to subsection (c) of this section. 47 (e) On or before July 1, 2030, and annually thereafter, the 48 Commissioner of Transportation shall submit, in accordance with the 49 provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing 50 committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 51 relating to transportation and the environment, a copy of the 52 Substitute Bill No. 1083 LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01083- R01-SB.docx } 3 of 3 transportation carbon budget for the state and any recommendations 53 for legislation to implement such budget. 54 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 October 1, 2023 New section Statement of Legislative Commissioners: In Subsec. (b), the first sentence was redrafted for clarity. TRA Joint Favorable Subst.