Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01083 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/28/2023

                             
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01083-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 3 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 1083  
January Session, 2023 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A TRANSPORTATION CARBON BUDGET 
FOR THE STATE.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2023) (a) Not later than July 1, 1 
2030, and annually thereafter, the Commissioner of Transportation, in 2 
consultation with the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 3 
Protection, shall establish a transportation carbon budget for the state 4 
that sets the maximum amount of greenhouse gas emissions permitted 5 
from the transportation sector. The commissioners shall consider the 6 
long-term emission reductions required by section 22a-200a of the 7 
general statutes when establishing the transportation carbon budget. 8 
(b) The Commissioner of Transportation shall adopt regulations, in 9 
accordance with the provisions of chapter 54 of the general statutes, to 10 
ensure transportation projects undertaken by the Department of 11 
Transportation, metropolitan planning organizations, as defined in 23 12 
USC 134, as amended from time to time, and municipalities do not 13 
exceed the maximum amount of greenhouse gas emissions established 14 
in the transportation carbon budget for the state pursuant to 15 
subsection (a) of this section. The regulations shall include, but need 16 
not be limited to, (1) a definition of "transportation project" that 17 
excludes transportation projects that are necessary for safety reasons or 18 
maintenance, (2) the methodology to calculate the greenhouse gas 19  Substitute Bill No. 1083 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01083-
R01-SB.docx }    
2 of 3 
 
emissions expected from future transportation projects, (3) where such 20 
projects are estimated to increase net greenhouse gas emissions, the 21 
ways to offset such emissions by undertaking greenhouse gas 22 
mitigation transportation projects that will reduce such emissions, and 23 
(4) a description of such greenhouse gas mitigation transportation 24 
projects, including, but not limited to, improving public 25 
transportation, constructing bikeways, pedestrian walkways or other 26 
multiuse trails or paths and installing electric vehicle charging 27 
infrastructure. Not later than July 1, 2028, the commissioner shall 28 
submit the regulations to the standing legislative regulation review 29 
committee for consideration under section 4-170 of the general statutes.  30 
(c) The Commissioner of Transportation, in consultation with the 31 
Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection, shall 32 
implement a public outreach plan to ensure sufficient public and 33 
stakeholder engagement in the development of the transportation 34 
carbon budget and the regulations required under subsection (b) of 35 
this section. 36 
(d) On or before January 1, 2025, and annually thereafter until 37 
January 1, 2030, the Commissioner of Transportation shall submit, in 38 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 39 
a report to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly 40 
having cognizance of matters relating to transportation and the 41 
environment. Such report shall include, but need not be limited to, the 42 
status of the development of the transportation carbon budget for the 43 
state and the regulations required under subsection (b) of this section, 44 
the level of collaboration among various stakeholders, and a 45 
description and the results of any public outreach conducted pursuant 46 
to subsection (c) of this section. 47 
(e) On or before July 1, 2030, and annually thereafter, the 48 
Commissioner of Transportation shall submit, in accordance with the 49 
provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing 50 
committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 51 
relating to transportation and the environment, a copy of the 52  Substitute Bill No. 1083 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01083-
R01-SB.docx }    
3 of 3 
 
transportation carbon budget for the state and any recommendations 53 
for legislation to implement such budget. 54 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2023 New section 
 
Statement of Legislative Commissioners:   
In Subsec. (b), the first sentence was redrafted for clarity.  
 
TRA Joint Favorable Subst.