Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01083 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-LCO \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01083-R01-
4-SB.docx
5-1 of 3
3+LCO No. 4724 1 of 3
64
7-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 1083
5+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1083
86 January Session, 2023
7+LCO No. 4724
98
9+
10+Referred to Committee on TRANSPORTATION
11+
12+
13+Introduced by:
14+(TRA)
1015
1116
1217
1318
1419 AN ACT ESTABLISHING A TRANSPORTATION CARBON BUDGET
1520 FOR THE STATE.
1621 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
1722 Assembly convened:
1823
1924 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2023) (a) Not later than July 1, 1
2025 2030, and annually thereafter, the Commissioner of Transportation, in 2
2126 consultation with the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 3
2227 Protection, shall establish a transportation carbon budget for the state 4
2328 that sets the maximum amount of greenhouse gas emissions permitted 5
2429 from the transportation sector. The commissioners shall consider the 6
2530 long-term emission reductions required by section 22a-200a of the 7
2631 general statutes when establishing the transportation carbon budget. 8
2732 (b) The Commissioner of Transportation shall adopt regulations, in 9
2833 accordance with the provisions of chapter 54 of the general statutes, to 10
2934 ensure transportation projects undertaken by the Department of 11
3035 Transportation, metropolitan planning organizations, as defined in 23 12
31-USC 134, as amended from time to time, and municipalities do not 13
32-exceed the maximum amount of greenhouse gas emissions established 14
33-in the transportation carbon budget for the state pursuant to 15
34-subsection (a) of this section. The regulations shall include, but need 16
35-not be limited to, (1) a definition of "transportation project" that 17
36-excludes transportation projects that are necessary for safety reasons or 18
37-maintenance, (2) the methodology to calculate the greenhouse gas 19 Substitute Bill No. 1083
36+USC 134, as amended from time to time, or municipalities adhere to the 13
37+transportation carbon budget for the state. The regulations shall include, 14
38+but need not be limited to, (1) a definition of "transportation project" that 15 Raised Bill No. 1083
3839
3940
40-LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01083-
41-R01-SB.docx }
42-2 of 3
4341
44-emissions expected from future transportation projects, (3) where such 20
45-projects are estimated to increase net greenhouse gas emissions, the 21
46-ways to offset such emissions by undertaking greenhouse gas 22
47-mitigation transportation projects that will reduce such emissions, and 23
48-(4) a description of such greenhouse gas mitigation transportation 24
49-projects, including, but not limited to, improving public 25
50-transportation, constructing bikeways, pedestrian walkways or other 26
51-multiuse trails or paths and installing electric vehicle charging 27
52-infrastructure. Not later than July 1, 2028, the commissioner shall 28
53-submit the regulations to the standing legislative regulation review 29
54-committee for consideration under section 4-170 of the general statutes. 30
55-(c) The Commissioner of Transportation, in consultation with the 31
56-Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection, shall 32
57-implement a public outreach plan to ensure sufficient public and 33
58-stakeholder engagement in the development of the transportation 34
59-carbon budget and the regulations required under subsection (b) of 35
60-this section. 36
61-(d) On or before January 1, 2025, and annually thereafter until 37
62-January 1, 2030, the Commissioner of Transportation shall submit, in 38
63-accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 39
64-a report to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly 40
65-having cognizance of matters relating to transportation and the 41
66-environment. Such report shall include, but need not be limited to, the 42
67-status of the development of the transportation carbon budget for the 43
68-state and the regulations required under subsection (b) of this section, 44
69-the level of collaboration among various stakeholders, and a 45
70-description and the results of any public outreach conducted pursuant 46
71-to subsection (c) of this section. 47
72-(e) On or before July 1, 2030, and annually thereafter, the 48
73-Commissioner of Transportation shall submit, in accordance with the 49
74-provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing 50
75-committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 51
76-relating to transportation and the environment, a copy of the 52 Substitute Bill No. 1083
42+LCO No. 4724 2 of 3
43+
44+excludes transportation projects that are necessary for safety reasons or 16
45+maintenance, (2) the methodology to calculate the greenhouse gas 17
46+emissions expected from future transportation projects, (3) where such 18
47+projects are estimated to increase net greenhouse gas emissions, the 19
48+ways to offset such emissions by undertaking greenhouse gas mitigation 20
49+transportation projects that will reduce such emission, and (4) a 21
50+description of such greenhouse gas mitigation transportation projects, 22
51+including, but not limited to, improving public transportation, 23
52+constructing bikeways, pedestrian walkways or other multiuse trails or 24
53+paths and installing electric vehicle charging infrastructure. Not later 25
54+than July 1, 2028, the commissioner shall submit the regulations to the 26
55+standing legislative regulation review committee for consideration 27
56+under section 4-170 of the general statutes. 28
57+(c) The Commissioner of Transportation, in consultation with the 29
58+Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection, shall 30
59+implement a public outreach plan to ensure sufficient public and 31
60+stakeholder engagement in the development of the transportation 32
61+carbon budget and the regulations required under subsection (b) of this 33
62+section. 34
63+(d) On or before January 1, 2024, and annually thereafter until 35
64+January 1, 2030, the Commissioner of Transportation shall submit, in 36
65+accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 37
66+a report to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly 38
67+having cognizance of matters relating to transportation and the 39
68+environment. Such report shall include, but need not be limited to, the 40
69+status of the development of the transportation carbon budget for the 41
70+state and the regulations required under subsection (b) of this section, 42
71+the level of collaboration among various stakeholders, and a description 43
72+of and the results of any public outreach conducted pursuant to 44
73+subsection (c) of this section. 45
74+(e) On or before July 1, 2030, and annually thereafter, the 46
75+Commissioner of Transportation shall submit, in accordance with the 47
76+provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing 48 Raised Bill No. 1083
7777
7878
79-LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01083-
80-R01-SB.docx }
81-3 of 3
8279
83-transportation carbon budget for the state and any recommendations 53
84-for legislation to implement such budget. 54
80+LCO No. 4724 3 of 3
81+
82+committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 49
83+relating to transportation and the environment a copy of the 50
84+transportation carbon budget for the state and any recommendations for 51
85+legislation to implement such budget. 52
8586 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
8687 sections:
8788
8889 Section 1 October 1, 2023 New section
8990
90-Statement of Legislative Commissioners:
91-In Subsec. (b), the first sentence was redrafted for clarity.
92-
93-TRA Joint Favorable Subst.
91+Statement of Purpose:
92+To establish a transportation carbon budget for the state.
93+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except
94+that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not
95+underlined.]
9496