Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01083 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/28/2023

                     
Researcher: HP 	Page 1 	3/28/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 1083  
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A TRANSPORTATION CARBON BUDGET 
FOR THE STATE.  
 
SUMMARY 
Starting by July 1, 2030, this bill requires the Department of 
Transportation (DOT), in consultation with the Department of Energy 
and Environmental Protection (DEEP), to annually establish a 
transportation carbon budget for the state that sets the maximum 
amount of greenhouse gas (GHG) emissions allowed from the 
transportation sector. When setting the budget, the agencies must 
consider the state’s long-term emissions reductions requirements (see 
BACKGROUND) .  
Under the bill, DOT must adopt regulations to ensure that 
transportation projects the state, metropolitan planning organizations, 
and municipalities undertake do not exceed the carbon budget’s GHG 
emissions limit. The regulations must include, at a minimum: 
1. a definition of “transportation project” that excludes projects 
necessary for maintenance or safety;  
2. a methodology to calculate the GHG emissions expected from 
future transportation projects;  
3. ways to offset the emissions for projects estimated to increase net 
emissions by undertaking GHG mitigation transportation 
projects that will reduce emissions; and  
4. a description of the GHG mitigation transportation projects, such 
as public transportation improvements; bikeway, walkway, or 
other multiuse trail or path construction; and electric vehicle 
charging installation.   2023SB-01083-R000251-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: HP 	Page 2 	3/28/23 
 
Under the bill, DOT, in consultation with DEEP, must implement a 
public outreach plan to sufficiently engage the public and stakeholders 
in developing the transportation carbon budget and associated 
regulations. The DOT commissioner must submit the regulations to the 
Regulation Review Committee by July 1, 2028. 
From 2025 through 2030, DOT must, annually by January 1, submit a 
report to the Transportation and Environment committees that includes 
(1) a status update on development of the carbon budget and 
regulations and (2) a description of the level of stakeholder collaboration 
and a description of the public outreach done and its results.  
The bill also requires DOT to annually submit, starting by July 1, 
2030, a copy of the transportation carbon budget and any related 
legislative recommendations to the Transportation and Environment 
committees. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2023 
BACKGROUND 
GHG Emissions Reductions Requirements 
By law, the state must reduce its GHG emissions to a level that is at 
least (1) 10% below 1990’s emission level by January 1, 2020; (2) 45% 
below 2001’s emissions level by January 1, 2030; and (3) 80% below 
2001’s emissions level by January 1, 2050 (CGS § 22a-200). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Transportation Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 27 Nay 8 (03/10/2023)