Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Public Act 23-19
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
House Calendar Number 493
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7349
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
File Number 221
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 150
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 12:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|