Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01102 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 5, 2023
Fiscal Note May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis August 31, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 5, 2023