Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01110 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 23, 2023
Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note April 5, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 17, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023