Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Public Act 23-136
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House Calendar Number 608
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8477
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
File Number 644
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 371
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|