Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01118 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note May 23, 2023
Fiscal Note April 18, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis August 21, 2023
Analysis May 25, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 15, 2023