Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Public Act 23-202
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
House Calendar Number 630
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9488
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
File Number 563
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 335
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/10
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|