Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01147 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 6, 2023
Fiscal Note June 5, 2023
Fiscal Note June 2, 2023
Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note April 13, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis September 26, 2023
Analysis June 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 27, 2023