Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01174 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-LCO 5014 \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01174-R01-
4-SB.docx
5-1 of 3
3+LCO No. 5014 1 of 3
64
7- Raised Bill No. 1174
5+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1174
86 January Session, 2023
97 LCO No. 5014
108
119
1210 Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES
1311
1412
1513 Introduced by:
1614 (HS)
1715
1816
1917
18+
2019 AN ACT CONCERNING MINIMUM EMPLOYEE WAGES, HEALTH
2120 CARE COVERAGE AND RETIREMENT BENEFITS FOR NONPROFIT
2221 PROVIDERS OF STATE -ADMINISTERED SERVICES FOR PERSONS
2322 WITH INTELLECTUAL OR DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES.
2423 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
2524 Assembly convened:
2625
27-Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) (a) As used in this section 1
28-and sections 2 to 4, inclusive, of this act, "nonprofit employer" means a 2
26+Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) (a) As used in this section and 1
27+sections 2 to 4, inclusive, of this act, "nonprofit employer" means a 2
2928 private provider that provides services to individuals with intellectual 3
30-or developmental disabilities authorized to receive support and 4
31-services through the Department of Developmental Services and the 5
29+or developmental disabilities authorized to receive support and services 4
30+through the Department of Developmental Services and the 5
3231 Department of Social Services. 6
3332 (b) Not later than December 1, 2023, a nonprofit employer shall 7
3433 implement a schedule of wage increases to employees who provide 8
35-services to individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities 9
36-to ensure that all such employees shall attain a minimum wage of 10
37-twenty-five dollars per hour not later than January 1, 2026. Not later 11
38-than January 1, 2025, and annually thereafter until January 1, 2027, a 12
39-nonprofit employer receiving funds pursuant to section 2 of this act 13
40-shall provide documentation of the schedule of wage increases to the 14 Bill No. 1174
34+services to individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities to 9
35+ensure that all such employees shall attain a minimum wage of twenty-10
36+five dollars per hour not later than January 1, 2026. Not later than 11
37+January 1, 2025, and annually thereafter until January 1, 2027, a 12
38+nonprofit employer receiving funds pursuant to section 2 of this act shall 13
39+provide documentation of the schedule of wage increases to the 14 Raised Bill No. 1174
4140
4241
43-LCO 5014 {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01174-
44-R01-SB.docx }
45-2 of 3
4642
47-Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management. Such 15
48-documentation shall demonstrate to the satisfaction of the secretary 16
49-that funds received pursuant to section 2 of this act were used for: (1) 17
50-Increasing employee salaries to ensure such minimum wage is attained 18
51-by January 1, 2026, and (2) increasing the salaries of employees who 19
52-earn over such minimum wage but not more than thirty dollars per 20
53-hour by five per cent in the 2024 and 2025 calendar years. 21
43+LCO No. 5014 2 of 3
44+
45+Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management. Such documentation 15
46+shall demonstrate to the satisfaction of the secretary that funds received 16
47+pursuant to section 2 of this act were used for: (1) Increasing employee 17
48+salaries to ensure such minimum wage is attained by January 1, 2026, 18
49+and (2) increasing the salaries of employees who earn over such 19
50+minimum wage but not more than thirty dollars per hour by five per 20
51+cent in the 2024 and 2025 calendar years. 21
5452 Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2023) The sums of one hundred six million 22
55-dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, and one hundred 23
56-ninety-six million dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, are 24
53+dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, and one hundred ninety-23
54+six million dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, are 24
5755 appropriated from the General Fund to the Office of Policy and 25
5856 Management for the purpose of increasing wages of employees of 26
5957 nonprofit employers who provide services to individuals with 27
6058 intellectual or developmental disabilities authorized to receive support 28
6159 and services through the Department of Developmental Services and 29
6260 the Department of Social Services. The Secretary of the Office of Policy 30
63-and Management shall transfer sufficient funds in each fiscal year to 31
64-the behavioral services program and the employment opportunities 32
65-and day services accounts of the Department of Developmental 33
66-Services and the community residential services account of the 34
67-Department of Social Services in order to raise the minimum wage of 35
68-such employees to twenty-five dollars per hour by January 1, 2026, and 36
69-increase the salaries of such employees who earn over such minimum 37
70-wage but not more than thirty dollars per hour by five per cent in the 38
71-2024 and 2025 calendar years. 39
61+and Management shall transfer sufficient funds in each fiscal year to the 31
62+behavioral services program and the employment opportunities and 32
63+day services accounts of the Department of Developmental Services and 33
64+the community residential services account of the Department of Social 34
65+Services in order to raise the minimum wage of such employees to 35
66+twenty-five dollars per hour by January 1, 2026, and increase the salaries 36
67+of such employees who earn over such minimum wage but not more 37
68+than thirty dollars per hour by five per cent in the 2024 and 2025 38
69+calendar years. 39
7270 Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2023) The Comptroller shall offer to 40
7371 nonprofit employers and their employees health care coverage under a 41
7472 partnership plan, as defined in section 3-123aaa of the general statutes. 42
7573 The Comptroller shall provide such coverage in accordance with 43
7674 sections 3-123bbb and 3-123ccc of the general statutes. 44
7775 Sec. 4. (Effective from passage) The sum of ninety million dollars is 45
7876 appropriated from the General Fund to the Office of Policy and 46
79-Management for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, for the 47 Bill No. 1174
77+Management for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, for the 47 Raised Bill No. 1174
8078
8179
82-LCO 5014 {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01174-
83-R01-SB.docx }
84-3 of 3
8580
86-establishment of a pool of funding to be allocated by the Secretary of 48
87-the Office of Policy and Management to nonprofit employers for the 49
81+LCO No. 5014 3 of 3
82+
83+establishment of a pool of funding to be allocated by the Secretary of the 48
84+Office of Policy and Management to nonprofit employers for the 49
8885 purpose of enhancing retirement benefits for their employees. The 50
8986 Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management shall prescribe (1) a 51
9087 process by which nonprofit employers can submit applications to 52
9188 receive funding from the pool, and (2) documentation requirements for 53
9289 such employers to demonstrate such funding was used to enhance 54
9390 retirement benefits for such employees. 55
9491 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
9592 sections:
9693
9794 Section 1 from passage New section
9895 Sec. 2 July 1, 2023 New section
9996 Sec. 3 July 1, 2023 New section
10097 Sec. 4 from passage New section
10198
102-HS Joint Favorable C/R APP
99+Statement of Purpose:
100+To raise minimum wages for employees of nonprofit providers that
101+contract with the state to provide services for persons with intellectual
102+and developmental disabilities, authorize health care coverage of such
103+employees under a state partnership health plan and provide state
104+funding to enhance employee retirement benefits.
105+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except
106+that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not
107+underlined.]
103108