Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01174 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/30/2023

                             
 
LCO 5014  \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01174-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 3 
  
 Raised Bill No. 1174  
January Session, 2023  
LCO No. 5014 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HS)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING MINIMUM EMPLOYEE WAGES, HEALTH 
CARE COVERAGE AND RETIREMENT BENEFITS FOR NONPROFIT 
PROVIDERS OF STATE -ADMINISTERED SERVICES FOR PERSONS 
WITH INTELLECTUAL OR DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) (a) As used in this section 1 
and sections 2 to 4, inclusive, of this act, "nonprofit employer" means a 2 
private provider that provides services to individuals with intellectual 3 
or developmental disabilities authorized to receive support and 4 
services through the Department of Developmental Services and the 5 
Department of Social Services. 6 
(b) Not later than December 1, 2023, a nonprofit employer shall 7 
implement a schedule of wage increases to employees who provide 8 
services to individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities 9 
to ensure that all such employees shall attain a minimum wage of 10 
twenty-five dollars per hour not later than January 1, 2026. Not later 11 
than January 1, 2025, and annually thereafter until January 1, 2027, a 12 
nonprofit employer receiving funds pursuant to section 2 of this act 13 
shall provide documentation of the schedule of wage increases to the 14  Bill No. 1174 
 
 
LCO 5014  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01174-
R01-SB.docx }   
2 of 3 
 
Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management. Such 15 
documentation shall demonstrate to the satisfaction of the secretary 16 
that funds received pursuant to section 2 of this act were used for: (1) 17 
Increasing employee salaries to ensure such minimum wage is attained 18 
by January 1, 2026, and (2) increasing the salaries of employees who 19 
earn over such minimum wage but not more than thirty dollars per 20 
hour by five per cent in the 2024 and 2025 calendar years. 21 
Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2023) The sums of one hundred six million 22 
dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, and one hundred 23 
ninety-six million dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, are 24 
appropriated from the General Fund to the Office of Policy and 25 
Management for the purpose of increasing wages of employees of 26 
nonprofit employers who provide services to individuals with 27 
intellectual or developmental disabilities authorized to receive support 28 
and services through the Department of Developmental Services and 29 
the Department of Social Services. The Secretary of the Office of Policy 30 
and Management shall transfer sufficient funds in each fiscal year to 31 
the behavioral services program and the employment opportunities 32 
and day services accounts of the Department of Developmental 33 
Services and the community residential services account of the 34 
Department of Social Services in order to raise the minimum wage of 35 
such employees to twenty-five dollars per hour by January 1, 2026, and 36 
increase the salaries of such employees who earn over such minimum 37 
wage but not more than thirty dollars per hour by five per cent in the 38 
2024 and 2025 calendar years. 39 
Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2023) The Comptroller shall offer to 40 
nonprofit employers and their employees health care coverage under a 41 
partnership plan, as defined in section 3-123aaa of the general statutes. 42 
The Comptroller shall provide such coverage in accordance with 43 
sections 3-123bbb and 3-123ccc of the general statutes. 44 
Sec. 4. (Effective from passage) The sum of ninety million dollars is 45 
appropriated from the General Fund to the Office of Policy and 46 
Management for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, for the 47  Bill No. 1174 
 
 
LCO 5014  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2023SB-01174-
R01-SB.docx }   
3 of 3 
 
establishment of a pool of funding to be allocated by the Secretary of 48 
the Office of Policy and Management to nonprofit employers for the 49 
purpose of enhancing retirement benefits for their employees. The 50 
Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management shall prescribe (1) a 51 
process by which nonprofit employers can submit applications to 52 
receive funding from the pool, and (2) documentation requirements for 53 
such employers to demonstrate such funding was used to enhance 54 
retirement benefits for such employees. 55 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2023 New section 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2023 New section 
Sec. 4 from passage New section 
 
HS Joint Favorable C/R 	APP