Senate | 04/06/2023 | File Number 469 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 273 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |