Senate | 05/09/2023 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | File Number 570 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 342 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |