House
|
05/26/2023
|
House Calendar Number 613
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 8756
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8753
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8747
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8791
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
File Number 610
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 364
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|