Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01226 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 30, 2023
Fiscal Note May 26, 2023
Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 26, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023