Senate | 05/03/2023 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | File Number 617 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 365 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |