Senate | 04/13/2023 | File Number 573 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 345 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |