Senate | 05/31/2023 | House Calendar Number 618 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8939 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | File Number 685 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 408 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Public Hearing 03/24 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |